skip to content

Alsunbul, Waleed Abdulaziz

CPSO#: 87657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.A. Alsunbul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Alsunbul ( CPSO# 87657 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Division of Neurology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:08 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2009 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2021 Active
 1. Dr. WALEED ABDULAZIZ ALSUNBUL may practise neurosurgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Hamilton General Hospital in Hamilton, Ontario; and

(ii) St. Joseph's Hospital in Hamilton, Ontario. 

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on December 31, 2021. 
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ALSUNBUL's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ALSUNBUL's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2021, and will expire on or before 31 December, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.