skip to content

Vosoughi, reza

CPSO#: 90201

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4168643177
Fax: 4168643178 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardio 1 Medical Clinic
230 Osborne St #2A, Winnipeg, MB R3
Winniipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Canada
Phone: (204) 287-5222
Fax: (204) 287-5223
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vosoughi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. r. Vosoughi ( CPSO# 90201 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5050


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:24 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REZA VOSOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSOUGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2009 to 24 Apr 2009
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 25 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013