skip to content

Voros, Gyula

CPSO#: 84724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 - 627 Lyons Ln
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7
Phone: (905) 338-0813
Fax: (905) 338-5747 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2250 Bovaird Drive East, Suite 602
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Canada
Phone: 905-789-7474
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: 1-905-527-4322 Ext. 42522
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gyula Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Voros ( CPSO# 84724 )

Business Address:
401 - 627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7
Phone Number: (905) 338-0813

Business Address:
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Suite 602
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 789-7474

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
M4 Surgical Centre
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GYULA VOROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 18 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008