Vorobeichik, Leon (CPSO#: 100831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Louis University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 855-756-3454
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEON VOROBEICHIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOROBEICHIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 06 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018