skip to content

Voitk, Andrus Juhan

CPSO#: 20708

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Sep 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French, German, Swedish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Apr 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2001