skip to content

Voinov, Valentin

CPSO#: 95935

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Valentin Voinov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Voinov ( CPSO# 95935 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
             Dr.  Valentin  Voinov may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.