skip to content

Vlahaki, Dean Matthew

CPSO#: 97636

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V5C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

690 MAIN STREET WEST
Hamilton ON  L8S1A4
Canada
Phone: 9055212100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2757 KING STREET EAST
Hamilton ON  L8G5E4
Canada
Phone: 9055737777
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Vlahaki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vlahaki ( CPSO# 97636 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
McMaster Clinic, 2nd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEAN MATTHEW VLAHAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAHAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017