skip to content

Vivian, Anthony Charles Harvey

CPSO#: 30426

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: www.medrecords.ca or 1-604-800-7079
Date Received: 13 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.