skip to content

Vives Santacana, Marc

CPSO#: 99809

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Navarra, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 08 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2014