skip to content

Vivas, Lucas

CPSO#: 98037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Div of General Internal Medicine
Room N2 880
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 98037 )
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 100651)

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Room N2 880
2100 Boviard Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physiatry
10th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUCAS VIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016