skip to content

Viswabandya, Auro

CPSO#: 92121

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Oriya

Education:Utkal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
Room 6-323 700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3256
Fax: (416) 946-4407 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Auro Viswabandya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Viswabandya ( CPSO# 92121 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
Suite 5-110
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 08 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 09 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Auro Viswabandya may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Hematology,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Viswabandya  holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration   automatically   expires   when   Dr.
                  Viswabandya no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.