skip to content

Virmani, Vivek

CPSO#: 91946

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:11 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013