skip to content

Viravan, Sorawit

CPSO#: 90088

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009