skip to content

Vira, Tasnim

CPSO#: 87070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Rapid Cardiology Assessment clinic
A216-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2484 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-1615 Dufferin St
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Canada
Phone: 647-477-2294
Fax: 416-654-4505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

491 Lawrence Ave W, 5th floor
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1366 Yonge St, Suite 210
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 927-8888
Fax: (416) 927-1898
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3080 Yonge St, Unit 4022
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 647-347-6644
Fax: 648-347-6647
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M6C 1C2
Canada
Phone: 416-883-3783
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tasnim Vira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vira ( CPSO# 87070 )

Business Address:
103 - 1615 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone Number: (647) 477-2294

Business Address:
829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M6C 1C2
Phone Number: 4168833783

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Echocardiology Lab
A214 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Suite 210
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 927-8888

Business Address:
Suite 301
1590 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 1Z8
Phone Number: (416) 927-8888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TASNIM VIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014