skip to content

Viola, Raymond Anthony

CPSO#: 33218

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raymond Viola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Viola ( CPSO# 33218 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records Kingston Health Sciences Centre 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019