skip to content

Vinegar, David Alan

CPSO#: 27885

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Written requests for medical records should be sent to: Suite 435 5 - 190 Minets Point Road Barrie, ON L4N 8J8
Date Received: 11 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2010