skip to content

Vincent, Ajoy

CPSO#: 92365

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8942 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vincent ( CPSO# 92365 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8942


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 09 Mar 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Ajoy Vincent may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Opthamology  and  Vision  Sciences, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr. Vincent holds an academic  appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Vincent no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.