skip to content

Villela, Renata Marques

CPSO#: 90563

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone: (905) 886-4176
Fax: (905) 886-1428 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R.M. Villela Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Villela ( CPSO# 90563 )

Business Address:
412-300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 886-4176

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENATA MARQUES VILLELA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLELA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014