skip to content

Villanueva Campos, Ana Maria

CPSO#: 119449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 17 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Navarra, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 1435
Fax: 4164805855 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANA MARIA VILLANUEVA CAMPOS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. VILLANUEVA CAMPOS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2021.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 16 Sep 2019
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021