skip to content

Villamere, James Patrick

CPSO#: 91023

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK VILLAMERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLAMERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018