skip to content

Vijayakumar, Sindhu

CPSO#: 96621

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 May 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 22 Jul 2011 to 13 Oct 2011
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 14 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 05 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 23 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 06 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 03 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2017