skip to content

Viguera Salazar, Milagro Caridad

CPSO#: 87270

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 520
280 Main Street
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone: (519) 227-0909
Fax: (519) 227-0740 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Milagro Viguera Salazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Viguera Salazar ( CPSO# 87270 )

Business Address:
Lucan Medical Centre
280 Main Street
Box 520
Lucan ON  N0M 2J0
Phone Number: (519) 227-4015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILAGRO CARIDAD VIGUERA SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGUERA SALAZAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2011