skip to content

Vigneault, Maurice

CPSO#: 22664

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Aug 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002