skip to content

Vigil, Humberto Rene

CPSO#: 98317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MG- 408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4733
Fax: (416) 480-6121 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON
P4N 8P2
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMBERTO RENE VIGIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017