skip to content

Vidal Peralta, Bertha Carolina Roxana Beatriz

CPSO#: 85833

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Honduras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110-1669 Broadway E
Third floor
Vancouver BC  V5N 1V9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERTHA CAROLINA ROXANA BEATRIZ VIDAL PERALTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIDAL PERALTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008