skip to content

Vicus, Danielle Lyn

CPSO#: 90400

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Danielle Lyn Vicus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vicus ( CPSO# 90400 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre Suite T2018
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Aug 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2009 to 19 Jun 2009
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Danielle Lyn Vicus may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics   and  Gynecology,  Division  of  Gynecologic  Oncology,
                        University of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Vicus  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.