skip to content

Vickers, Michael MacDonald

CPSO#: 89796

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Vickers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vickers ( CPSO# 89796 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 761-4999

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
Box 911
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MACDONALD VICKERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014