skip to content

Vicente, Lorena Claudia

CPSO#: 29120

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients that saw Dr. Vicente at the Women's Health in Women's Hands Community Health Centre should contact the Centre to request copies of the records.
Date Received: 02 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013