skip to content

Vezina, Claude Theodore

CPSO#: 30692

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Claude Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2013
Corporation Name: Dr. C. Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

British Columbia

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 May 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 2017