skip to content

Vethanayagam, Adrian John

CPSO#: 92089

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dewart Vethanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 21 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Anesthesiology

Western University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Sep 2020