skip to content

Vesely, Alexander Eugene

CPSO#: 90039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
EL - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2013