skip to content

Verschuren, Rex Edward

CPSO#: 58317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13 Lapsley Road
Toronto ON  M1B 1K1
Phone: (416) 754-9595
Fax: (416) 754-3946 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rex Verschuren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verschuren ( CPSO# 58317 )

Business Address:
13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 1K1
Phone Number: (416) 754-9593

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REX EDWARD VERSCHUREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERSCHUREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988