skip to content

Verrilli, David Vincent

CPSO#: 94641

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard St. East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-0566
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Vincent Verrilli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Verrilli ( CPSO# 94641 )

Business Address:
200 - 66 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Phone Number: (416) 922-0566

Business Address:
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID VINCENT VERRILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERRILLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2011 to 04 Feb 2011
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011