skip to content

Verma, Neil

CPSO#: 85845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-6526 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Toronto Polyclinic
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Verma ( CPSO# 85845 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEIL VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006