skip to content

Verma, Manisha

CPSO#: 93130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
171 East Liberty Street
Unit 102
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dialogue
179 John St
Unit 301
Toronto ON  M5T 1X4
Canada
Phone: 514-788-8867
Fax: 647-689-3725
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Manisha Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Verma ( CPSO# 93130 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANISHA VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012