skip to content

Verma, Ashim

CPSO#: 96104

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 10 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ashim Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verma ( CPSO# 96104 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 1, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 16, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ashim Verma voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH and, further, that effective November 1, 2018, Dr. Verma’s privileges at WRH were revoked.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  August 7, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 7, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital (WRH) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective August 3, 2018, Dr. Ashim Verma voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at WRH until August 20, 2018, during the course of an investigation by WRH.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2011 to 30 Jul 2011
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 10 Jan 2020

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Verma’s professional misconduct have been referredto what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Verma engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in that he downloaded, possessed and viewed child pornography. It is also alleged that Dr. Verma has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice medicine in that on October 9, 2019 he was found guilty of Possession of Child Pornography contrary to section 163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 10 Jan 2020


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2020 Active

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: February 7, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT

Ashim Verma was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Possession of child pornography, contrary to section163.1(4) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: October 9, 2019
SENTENCE: [January 23, 2020]
-2.5 years imprisonment;
-Prohibited from possessing weapons for 20 years after his release from imprisonment;
-Order to comply with SOIRA (Sex Offender Information Registration Act) for 20 years;
-An order prohibiting Ashim Verma for 10 years (plus the imprisonment period) from:
(a) attending a public park or public swimming area where persons under the age of 16 years are present or can reasonably be expected to be present, or a daycare centre, school ground, playground or community centre, unless accompanied by his wife and his attendance is associated with his daughter’s activities.
(b) seeking, obtaining or continuing any employment, whether or not the employment is remunerated, or becoming or being a volunteer in a capacity that involves being in a position of trust or authority towards persons under the age of 16 years.
(c) having any contact – including communicating by any means – with a person who is under the age of 16 years, unless the offender does so under the supervision of his wife. This prohibition does not restrict offender’s contact with his own child.
(d) Using the internet or other digital network, unless the offender does so in accordance with conditions set by the court.