skip to content

Verma, Amol Anand

CPSO#: 95353

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medicine
30 Bond Street Cardinal Carter Wing
14-077B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5431
Fax: 416-864-5714 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amol Verma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verma ( CPSO# 95353 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 14-077B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMOL ANAND VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015