skip to content

Vergel De Dios, Oscar

CPSO#: 31481

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Oscar Vergel De Dios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Windsor General Hospital - Metropolitan 1995 Lens Ave Windsor, ON N8W 1L9
Date Received: 17 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019