skip to content

Verduyn, Robin Frances

CPSO#: 88551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verduyn ( CPSO# 88551 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN FRANCES VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010