skip to content

Verduyn, Robin Frances

CPSO#: 88551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Ave East
Room C210
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: (416)285-3666
Fax: (416)285-3754 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verduyn ( CPSO# 88551 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416)285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN FRANCES VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010