skip to content

Verdejo-Aguilar, Nicolas Alfonso

CPSO#: 30412

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 1984