Verbora, Michael John (CPSO#: 100717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMC
407 - 1 Eglinton East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone: (647) 406-4902
Fax: (416) 482-3535
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Seneca College - Student Health
1750 Finch Ave. East
Toronto ON  M2J 2X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Verbora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Verbora ( CPSO# 100717)

Business Address:
CMC
Unit 407
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (647) 406-4902

Business Address:
1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 2X5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN VERBORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015