Vera Badillo, Francisco Emilio (CPSO#: 96275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Sep 2015

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Escuela De Medicina Ignacio A.Santos, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 18 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jun 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Francisco Emilio Vera Badillo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology,
                        Queen's University, in which Dr. Vera Badillo holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Vera
                  Badillo no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on September 18, 2015 and expires on June 30,
                  2021. Upon renewal of Dr. Vera Badillo's academic appointment at Queen's
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraph 2 above.