skip to content

Venkat, Siva

CPSO#: 101189

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2018 to 11 Nov 2018
Elective Trainee - Urology

McMaster University, 12 Nov 2018 to 28 Nov 2018
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2018 to 12 Dec 2018
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2018