skip to content

Vengalil, Salil

CPSO#: 99002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013