skip to content

Vellani, Karim

CPSO#: 97637

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St.
St. Michael's Hospital
Family Practice Unit
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-867-7428
Fax: 416-867-7498 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

MediCall
Suite 212
2 Toronto St
Toronto ON  M5C2B5
Canada
Phone: 6478738936
Fax: 647-689-5893
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karim Vellani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vellani ( CPSO# 97637 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Family Practice Unit
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARIM VELLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014