skip to content

Velker, Vikram Machindra

CPSO#: 93601

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Fax: 519-685-8627 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Velker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Velker ( CPSO# 93601 )
Dr. B. Kaschor ( CPSO# 100642)

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Business Address:
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621


Corporation Name: VM Velker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Velker ( CPSO# 93601 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: 5196858500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKRAM MACHINDRA VELKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015