skip to content

Veldhuijzen Van Zanten, Stephanie Carmen Marlieke

CPSO#: 98333

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D.A. Vincent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Veldhuijzen Van Zanten ( CPSO# 98333 )
Dr. D. Vincent ( CPSO# 95445 )

Business Address:
1937 Portobello Boulevard
PO Box 17046
Ottawa ON  K4A 4W8
Phone Number: (613) 422-1255

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Orleans ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CARMEN MARLIEKE VELDHUIJZEN VAN ZANTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELDHUIJZEN VAN ZANTEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016