skip to content

Velayutham, Veerabadran

CPSO#: 84961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2006 to 24 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007