skip to content

Vegda, Ketan

CPSO#: 93871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
60 White Squirrel Way
Second Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 36946
Fax: 416-583-1219 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Central Toronto Youth Service
Suite 300 - 65 Wellesley St E
Toronto ON  M4Y1G7
Canada
Phone: 416-924-2100
Fax: 416-924-2930
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Parkdale-Queen West CHC
168 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5V2R4
Canada
Phone: 416-703-8482
Fax: 416-703-8479
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KETAN VEGDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEGDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015